Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1355 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 27, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2022
Analysis April 18, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022