Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1366 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 16, 2022
Analysis March 10, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022