Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1378 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022