Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
Chapter 301
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2022
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (46-2-12-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (27-0-3-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Senate Conference adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
House Conference adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
House Conference caucus date
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Conference caucus date
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Senate Conference report: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Senate Conference members: ROGERS has been replaced by BORRELLI
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conference members: PARKER has been replaced by NGUYEN
NGUYEN has been replaced by PAYNE
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
House Conference members: BLACKMAN, HERNANDEZ M, PAYNE
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
House Conference appointed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate Conference members: PETERSEN, QUEZADA, BORRELLI
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Senate Conference appointed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (54-4-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-2-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|