Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1401 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-House Engrossed Senate Bill continuation; state department of corrections. State of Arizona Senate Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022 CHAPTER 327 SENATE BILL 1401 An Act amending title 41, chapter 11, article 1, Arizona Revised Statutes by adding section 41-1610.02; repealing section 41-3022.15, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.15; relating to the state department of corrections. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
1+House Engrossed Senate Bill continuation; state department of corrections. State of Arizona Senate Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022 SENATE BILL 1401 An Act amending title 41, chapter 11, article 1, Arizona Revised Statutes by adding section 41-1610.02; repealing section 41-3022.15, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.15; relating to the state department of corrections. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
2+
3+
4+
5+
26
37
48
59 House Engrossed Senate Bill continuation; state department of corrections.
610 State of Arizona Senate Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022
7-CHAPTER 327
811 SENATE BILL 1401
912
1013 House Engrossed Senate Bill
1114
1215
1316
1417 continuation; state department of corrections.
18+
19+
1520
1621
1722
1823
1924
2025
2126
2227 State of Arizona
2328
2429 Senate
2530
2631 Fifty-fifth Legislature
2732
2833 Second Regular Session
2934
3035 2022
3136
3237
3338
3439
3540
3641
3742
38-CHAPTER 327
43+SENATE BILL 1401
3944
4045
41-
42-SENATE BILL 1401
4346
4447
4548
4649 An Act
4750
4851
4952
5053 amending title 41, chapter 11, article 1, Arizona Revised Statutes by adding section 41-1610.02; repealing section 41-3022.15, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3030.15; relating to the state department of corrections.
5154
5255
5356
5457
5558
5659 (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
5760
5861
5962
6063 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Title 41, chapter 11, article 1, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-1610.02, to read: START_STATUTE41-1610.02. Auditor general review; annual report A. THE AUDITOR GENERAL SHALL ANNUALLY REVIEW THE DEPARTMENT'S COMPLIANCE WITH ALL OF THE FOLLOWING: 1. THE INMATE TRANSITION PROGRAM ESTABLISHED PURSUANT TO SECTION 31-281. 2. THE RELEASE AND REPORTING PROVISIONS PRESCRIBED IN SECTION 31-285. 3. THE REQUIREMENT AS PRESCRIBED IN SECTION 41-1602 TO PROVIDE REHABILITATION, AND THE NUMBER OF INMATES WHO ENROLL AND PARTICIPATE in AND COMPLETE THE DEPARTMENT'S REHABILITATIVE SELF-IMPROVEMENT AND TREATMENT PROGRAMS BY INSTITUTION AND A DESCRIPTION OF EACH PROGRAM. 4. THE EARNED RELEASE CREDIT PROGRAM PURSUANT TO SECTIONS 41-1604.06, 41-1604.07 AND 41-1604.10. 5. THE REPORTING REQUIREMENTS PURSUANT TO SECTION 41-1604.14. 6. THE DEPARTMENT'S OWN POLICIES REGARDING INDUSTRY RECOMMENDED REPORTING GUIDELINES. B. ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 1, 2023 AND EACH YEAR THEREAFTER, THE AUDITOR GENERAL SHALL SUBMIT A REPORT TO THE GOVERNOR, PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE, SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES AND JOINT LEGISLATIVE AUDIT COMMITTEE AND SHALL PROVIDE A COPY OF THIS REPORT TO THE SECRETARY OF STATE. THE REPORT SHALL CONTAIN THE AUDITOR GENERAL'S FINDINGS RELATING TO THE REVIEW UNDER SUBSECTION A OF THIS SECTION. END_STATUTE Sec. 2. Repeal Section 41-3022.15, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 3. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.15, to read: START_STATUTE41-3030.15. State department of corrections; termination July 1, 2030 A. THE STATE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS TERMINATES ON JULY 1, 2030. B. TITLE 41, CHAPTER 11 and this section are REPEALED ON JANUARY 1, 2031. END_STATUTE Sec. 4. Legislative assessment; state department of corrections; audit; delayed repeal A. The legislature may annually assess whether the state department of corrections is meeting the requirements prescribed in sections 31-281, 31-285 and 41-1602, Arizona Revised Statutes. The legislature may request that the auditor general conduct an additional audit of the state department of corrections and may amend the termination date of the state department of corrections. B. This section is repealed from and after June 30, 2030. Sec. 5. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the state department of corrections to encompass the correctional programs of this state and to provide supervisory staff and administrative functions at the state level for all matters relating to the institutionalization, rehabilitation, parole and community supervision functions of all adult offenders. Sec. 6. Retroactivity Sections 2 and 3 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2022.
6164
6265 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:
6366
6467 Section 1. Title 41, chapter 11, article 1, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-1610.02, to read:
6568
6669 START_STATUTE41-1610.02. Auditor general review; annual report
6770
6871 A. THE AUDITOR GENERAL SHALL ANNUALLY REVIEW THE DEPARTMENT'S COMPLIANCE WITH ALL OF THE FOLLOWING:
6972
7073 1. THE INMATE TRANSITION PROGRAM ESTABLISHED PURSUANT TO SECTION 31-281.
7174
7275 2. THE RELEASE AND REPORTING PROVISIONS PRESCRIBED IN SECTION 31-285.
7376
7477 3. THE REQUIREMENT AS PRESCRIBED IN SECTION 41-1602 TO PROVIDE REHABILITATION, AND THE NUMBER OF INMATES WHO ENROLL AND PARTICIPATE in AND COMPLETE THE DEPARTMENT'S REHABILITATIVE SELF-IMPROVEMENT AND TREATMENT PROGRAMS BY INSTITUTION AND A DESCRIPTION OF EACH PROGRAM.
7578
7679 4. THE EARNED RELEASE CREDIT PROGRAM PURSUANT TO SECTIONS 41-1604.06, 41-1604.07 AND 41-1604.10.
7780
7881 5. THE REPORTING REQUIREMENTS PURSUANT TO SECTION 41-1604.14.
7982
8083 6. THE DEPARTMENT'S OWN POLICIES REGARDING INDUSTRY RECOMMENDED REPORTING GUIDELINES.
8184
8285 B. ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 1, 2023 AND EACH YEAR THEREAFTER, THE AUDITOR GENERAL SHALL SUBMIT A REPORT TO THE GOVERNOR, PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE, SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES AND JOINT LEGISLATIVE AUDIT COMMITTEE AND SHALL PROVIDE A COPY OF THIS REPORT TO THE SECRETARY OF STATE. THE REPORT SHALL CONTAIN THE AUDITOR GENERAL'S FINDINGS RELATING TO THE REVIEW UNDER SUBSECTION A OF THIS SECTION. END_STATUTE
8386
8487 Sec. 2. Repeal
8588
8689 Section 41-3022.15, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.
8790
8891 Sec. 3. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3030.15, to read:
8992
9093 START_STATUTE41-3030.15. State department of corrections; termination July 1, 2030
9194
9295 A. THE STATE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS TERMINATES ON JULY 1, 2030.
9396
9497 B. TITLE 41, CHAPTER 11 and this section are REPEALED ON JANUARY 1, 2031. END_STATUTE
9598
9699 Sec. 4. Legislative assessment; state department of corrections; audit; delayed repeal
97100
98101 A. The legislature may annually assess whether the state department of corrections is meeting the requirements prescribed in sections 31-281, 31-285 and 41-1602, Arizona Revised Statutes. The legislature may request that the auditor general conduct an additional audit of the state department of corrections and may amend the termination date of the state department of corrections.
99102
100103 B. This section is repealed from and after June 30, 2030.
101104
102105 Sec. 5. Purpose
103106
104107 Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the state department of corrections to encompass the correctional programs of this state and to provide supervisory staff and administrative functions at the state level for all matters relating to the institutionalization, rehabilitation, parole and community supervision functions of all adult offenders.
105108
106109 Sec. 6. Retroactivity
107110
108111 Sections 2 and 3 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2022.
109-
110- APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR JUNE 28, 2022. FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 28, 2022.
111-
112-
113-
114-
115-
116-
117-
118-APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR JUNE 28, 2022.
119-
120-
121-
122-FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 28, 2022.