Senate | 02/15/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |