Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1410 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 18, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 7, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022