Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1444 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2022

Engrossed

Bill June 22, 2022
Bill February 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 24, 2022
Analysis June 23, 2022
Analysis March 16, 2022
Analysis March 10, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022