Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1459 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill February 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 11, 2022
Analysis March 16, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022