Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1490 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 1, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 24, 2022
Analysis June 23, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022