Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1515 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 30, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis March 10, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022