Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1555 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 REFERENCE TITLE: minimum wage; increase State of Arizona Senate Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022 SB 1555 Introduced by Senator Quezada AN ACT repealing section 23-362, Arizona Revised Statutes, as amended by Laws 1997, chapter 51, section 1; amending section 23-363, arizona revised statutes; relating to employment practices. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
22
33
44
55
66
77
88
99 REFERENCE TITLE: minimum wage; increase
1010 State of Arizona Senate Fifty-fifth Legislature Second Regular Session 2022
1111 SB 1555
1212 Introduced by Senator Quezada
1313
1414 REFERENCE TITLE: minimum wage; increase
1515
1616
1717
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424 State of Arizona
2525
2626 Senate
2727
2828 Fifty-fifth Legislature
2929
3030 Second Regular Session
3131
3232 2022
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737
3838
3939
4040 SB 1555
4141
4242
4343
4444 Introduced by
4545
4646 Senator Quezada
4747
4848
4949
5050
5151
5252 AN ACT
5353
5454
5555
5656 repealing section 23-362, Arizona Revised Statutes, as amended by Laws 1997, chapter 51, section 1; amending section 23-363, arizona revised statutes; relating to employment practices.
5757
5858
5959
6060
6161
6262 (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
6363
6464
6565
6666 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Subject to the requirements of article IV, part 1, section 1, Constitution of Arizona, section 23-362, Arizona Revised Statutes, as amended by Laws 1997, chapter 51, section 1, is repealed. Sec. 2. Subject to the requirements of article IV, part 1, section 1, Constitution of Arizona, section 23-363, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended to read: START_STATUTE23-363. Minimum wage A. Employers shall pay employees no not less than the minimum wage, which shall be not less than: 1. $10 on and after January 1, 2017. 2. $10.50 on and after January 1, 2018. 3. $11 on and after January 1, 2019. 4. $12 on and after January 1, 2020 $20 per hour on and after the effective date of this amendment to this section. B. The minimum wage shall be increased on January 1, 2021 2023 and on January 1 of successive years, by the increase in the cost of living. The increase in the cost of living shall be measured by the percentage increase as of August of the immediately preceding year over the level as of August of the previous year of the consumer price index (all urban consumers, U.S. United States city average for all items) or its successor index as published by the U.S. United States department of labor or its successor agency, with the amount of the minimum wage increase rounded to the nearest multiple of five cents $.05. C. For any employee who customarily and regularly receives tips or gratuities from patrons or others, the employer may pay a wage up to $3.00 per hour less than the minimum wage if the employer can establish by its the employer's records of charged tips or by the employee's declaration for federal insurance contributions act (FICA) purposes that for each week, when adding tips received to wages paid, the employee received not less than the minimum wage for all hours worked. Compliance with this provision subsection will be determined by averaging tips received by the employee over the course of the employer's payroll period or any other period selected by the employer that complies with regulations adopted by the commission. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Requirements for enactment; three-fourths vote Pursuant to article IV, part 1, section 1, Constitution of Arizona, section 23-362, Arizona Revised Statutes, as amended by Laws 1997, chapter 51, section 1 and repealed by this act, and section 23-363, Arizona Revised Statutes, as amended by this act, are effective only on the affirmative vote of at least three-fourths of the members of each house of the legislature.
6767
6868 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:
6969
7070 Section 1. Repeal
7171
7272 Subject to the requirements of article IV, part 1, section 1, Constitution of Arizona, section 23-362, Arizona Revised Statutes, as amended by Laws 1997, chapter 51, section 1, is repealed.
7373
7474 Sec. 2. Subject to the requirements of article IV, part 1, section 1, Constitution of Arizona, section 23-363, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended to read:
7575
7676 START_STATUTE23-363. Minimum wage
7777
7878 A. Employers shall pay employees no not less than the minimum wage, which shall be not less than:
7979
8080 1. $10 on and after January 1, 2017.
8181
8282 2. $10.50 on and after January 1, 2018.
8383
8484 3. $11 on and after January 1, 2019.
8585
8686 4. $12 on and after January 1, 2020 $20 per hour on and after the effective date of this amendment to this section.
8787
8888 B. The minimum wage shall be increased on January 1, 2021 2023 and on January 1 of successive years, by the increase in the cost of living. The increase in the cost of living shall be measured by the percentage increase as of August of the immediately preceding year over the level as of August of the previous year of the consumer price index (all urban consumers, U.S. United States city average for all items) or its successor index as published by the U.S. United States department of labor or its successor agency, with the amount of the minimum wage increase rounded to the nearest multiple of five cents $.05.
8989
9090 C. For any employee who customarily and regularly receives tips or gratuities from patrons or others, the employer may pay a wage up to $3.00 per hour less than the minimum wage if the employer can establish by its the employer's records of charged tips or by the employee's declaration for federal insurance contributions act (FICA) purposes that for each week, when adding tips received to wages paid, the employee received not less than the minimum wage for all hours worked. Compliance with this provision subsection will be determined by averaging tips received by the employee over the course of the employer's payroll period or any other period selected by the employer that complies with regulations adopted by the commission. END_STATUTE
9191
9292 Sec. 3. Requirements for enactment; three-fourths vote
9393
9494 Pursuant to article IV, part 1, section 1, Constitution of Arizona, section 23-362, Arizona Revised Statutes, as amended by Laws 1997, chapter 51, section 1 and repealed by this act, and section 23-363, Arizona Revised Statutes, as amended by this act, are effective only on the affirmative vote of at least three-fourths of the members of each house of the legislature.