Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1596 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 18, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 7, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022