Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1607 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 9, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 3, 2022
Analysis March 28, 2022
Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022