Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1638 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill March 9, 2022

Chaptered

Bill April 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2022
Analysis April 11, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis March 8, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022