Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1639 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022

Chaptered

Bill March 28, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2022
Analysis March 16, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis