Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1640 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill March 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis March 9, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022
Analysis