Senate | 03/09/2022 | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-14-2-0) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |