Senate | 03/14/2022 | Senate motion to reconsider third reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-17-1-0) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |