Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1654 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 13, 2022
Analysis April 20, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 2, 2022