Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1702 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022