Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1709 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 7, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022