Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1711 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis March 3, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022