House | 03/23/2022 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Assigned to House GE Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-2-2-0) | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |