Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2005 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 27, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 2, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis January 19, 2023
Analysis January 16, 2023