Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2039 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/11/2023

                            REFERENCE TITLE: dental board; continuation             State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023           HB 2039           Introduced by  Representative Bliss                    An Act   repealing section 41-3023.07, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3031.07; relating to the state board of dental examiners.     (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)   

 

 

 

REFERENCE TITLE: dental board; continuation
State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023
HB 2039
Introduced by  Representative Bliss

REFERENCE TITLE: dental board; continuation

 

 

 

 

State of Arizona

House of Representatives

Fifty-sixth Legislature

First Regular Session

2023

 

 

 

HB 2039

 

Introduced by 

Representative Bliss

 

 

 

 

 

 

 

 

An Act

 

repealing section 41-3023.07, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3031.07; relating to the state board of dental examiners.

 

 

(TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)

 

 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3023.07, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3031.07, to read: START_STATUTE41-3031.07. State board of dental examiners; termination July 1, 2031 A. THE STATE BOARD OF DENTAL EXAMINERS TERMINATES ON JULY 1, 2031. B. Title 32, Chapter 11 and this section are repealed on january 1, 2032.END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the state board of dental examiners to promote the safe and professional practice of dentistry in this state. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act are effective retroactively to from and after July 1, 2023. 

Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:

Section 1. Repeal

Section 41-3023.07, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.

Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3031.07, to read:

START_STATUTE41-3031.07. State board of dental examiners; termination July 1, 2031

A. THE STATE BOARD OF DENTAL EXAMINERS TERMINATES ON JULY 1, 2031.

B. Title 32, Chapter 11 and this section are repealed on january 1, 2032.END_STATUTE

Sec. 3. Purpose

Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the state board of dental examiners to promote the safe and professional practice of dentistry in this state.

Sec. 4. Retroactivity

Sections 1 and 2 of this act are effective retroactively to from and after July 1, 2023.