Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2064 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis March 2, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis January 26, 2023
Analysis January 23, 2023
Analysis January 20, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2023