Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2108 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 11, 2023
Bill January 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 1, 2023
Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023
Analysis February 3, 2023
Analysis January 28, 2023