Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2137 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 REFERENCE TITLE: children's health insurance program; eligibility State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023 HB 2137 Introduced by Representatives Salman: De Los Santos, Ortiz, Sandoval, Stahl Hamilton An Act amending section 36-2981, Arizona Revised Statutes; relating to the children's health insurance program. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
22
33
44
55
66
77
88
99 REFERENCE TITLE: children's health insurance program; eligibility
1010 State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023
1111 HB 2137
1212 Introduced by Representatives Salman: De Los Santos, Ortiz, Sandoval, Stahl Hamilton
1313
1414 REFERENCE TITLE: children's health insurance program; eligibility
1515
1616
1717
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424 State of Arizona
2525
2626 House of Representatives
2727
2828 Fifty-sixth Legislature
2929
3030 First Regular Session
3131
3232 2023
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737
3838
3939
4040 HB 2137
4141
4242
4343
4444 Introduced by
4545
4646 Representatives Salman: De Los Santos, Ortiz, Sandoval, Stahl Hamilton
4747
4848
4949
5050
5151
5252
5353
5454
5555
5656
5757
5858
5959
6060
6161
6262
6363
6464 An Act
6565
6666
6767
6868 amending section 36-2981, Arizona Revised Statutes; relating to the children's health insurance program.
6969
7070
7171
7272
7373
7474 (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
7575
7676
7777
7878 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Section 36-2981, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended to read: START_STATUTE36-2981. Definitions In this article, unless the context otherwise requires: 1. "Administration" means the Arizona health care cost containment system administration. 2. "Contractor" means a health plan that contracts with the administration for the provision of to provide hospitalization and medical care to members according to the provisions of this article or a qualifying plan. 3. "Director" means the director of the administration. 4. "Federal poverty level" means the federal poverty level guidelines published annually by the United States department of health and human services. 5. "Health plan" means an entity that contracts with the administration for services provided pursuant to article 1 of this chapter. 6. "Member" means a person who is eligible for and enrolled in the program, who is under nineteen years of age and whose gross household income meets the following requirements: (a) Beginning on November 1, 1998 through September 30, 1999, has income at or below one hundred fifty per cent of the federal poverty level. (b) (a) Beginning on October 1, 1999 and for each fiscal year thereafter through September 30, 2023, has income at or below two hundred per cent percent of the federal poverty level. (b) Beginning on October 1, 2023 and for each fiscal year thereafter, has income at or below two hundred fifty percent of the federal poverty level. 7. "Noncontracting provider" means an entity that provides hospital or medical care but does not have a contract or subcontract with the administration. 8. "Physician" means a person who is licensed pursuant to title 32, chapter 13 or 17. 9. "Prepaid capitated" means a method of payment by which a contractor delivers health care services for the duration of a contract to a specified number of members based on a fixed rate per member, per month without regard to the number of members who receive care or the amount of health care services provided to a member. 10. "Primary care physician" means a physician who is a family practitioner, general practitioner, pediatrician, general internist, obstetrician or gynecologist. 11. "Primary care practitioner" means a nurse practitioner who is certified pursuant to title 32, chapter 15 or a physician assistant who is licensed pursuant to title 32, chapter 25 and who is acting within the respective scope of practice of those chapters. 12. "Program" means the children's health insurance program. 13. "Qualifying plan" means a contractor that contracts with the state pursuant to section 38-651 to provide health and accident insurance for state employees and that provides services to members pursuant to section 36-2989, subsection A. 14. "Special health care district" means a special health care district organized pursuant to title 48, chapter 31. 15. "Tribal facility" means a facility that is operated by an Indian tribe and that is authorized to provide services pursuant to Public Law 93-638, as amended. END_STATUTE
7979
8080 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:
8181
8282 Section 1. Section 36-2981, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended to read:
8383
8484 START_STATUTE36-2981. Definitions
8585
8686 In this article, unless the context otherwise requires:
8787
8888 1. "Administration" means the Arizona health care cost containment system administration.
8989
9090 2. "Contractor" means a health plan that contracts with the administration for the provision of to provide hospitalization and medical care to members according to the provisions of this article or a qualifying plan.
9191
9292 3. "Director" means the director of the administration.
9393
9494 4. "Federal poverty level" means the federal poverty level guidelines published annually by the United States department of health and human services.
9595
9696 5. "Health plan" means an entity that contracts with the administration for services provided pursuant to article 1 of this chapter.
9797
9898 6. "Member" means a person who is eligible for and enrolled in the program, who is under nineteen years of age and whose gross household income meets the following requirements:
9999
100100 (a) Beginning on November 1, 1998 through September 30, 1999, has income at or below one hundred fifty per cent of the federal poverty level.
101101
102102 (b) (a) Beginning on October 1, 1999 and for each fiscal year thereafter through September 30, 2023, has income at or below two hundred per cent percent of the federal poverty level.
103103
104104 (b) Beginning on October 1, 2023 and for each fiscal year thereafter, has income at or below two hundred fifty percent of the federal poverty level.
105105
106106 7. "Noncontracting provider" means an entity that provides hospital or medical care but does not have a contract or subcontract with the administration.
107107
108108 8. "Physician" means a person who is licensed pursuant to title 32, chapter 13 or 17.
109109
110110 9. "Prepaid capitated" means a method of payment by which a contractor delivers health care services for the duration of a contract to a specified number of members based on a fixed rate per member, per month without regard to the number of members who receive care or the amount of health care services provided to a member.
111111
112112 10. "Primary care physician" means a physician who is a family practitioner, general practitioner, pediatrician, general internist, obstetrician or gynecologist.
113113
114114 11. "Primary care practitioner" means a nurse practitioner who is certified pursuant to title 32, chapter 15 or a physician assistant who is licensed pursuant to title 32, chapter 25 and who is acting within the respective scope of practice of those chapters.
115115
116116 12. "Program" means the children's health insurance program.
117117
118118 13. "Qualifying plan" means a contractor that contracts with the state pursuant to section 38-651 to provide health and accident insurance for state employees and that provides services to members pursuant to section 36-2989, subsection A.
119119
120120 14. "Special health care district" means a special health care district organized pursuant to title 48, chapter 31.
121121
122122 15. "Tribal facility" means a facility that is operated by an Indian tribe and that is authorized to provide services pursuant to Public Law 93-638, as amended. END_STATUTE