Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis January 31, 2023
Analysis January 26, 2023