Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2198 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 1, 2023
Analysis January 27, 2023