Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2213 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 23, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023