Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2217 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023
Analysis January 27, 2023