Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2218 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023