Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2225 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 1, 2023
Analysis January 30, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 12, 2023