Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2226 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 1, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023
Analysis January 31, 2023
Analysis January 30, 2023