Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2254 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis May 23, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023