Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2288 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis February 24, 2023
Analysis February 2, 2023
Analysis January 30, 2023