Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2289 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023