Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2292 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 12, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 15, 2023
Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis June 12, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023
Analysis March 2, 2023
Analysis February 24, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023