Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2307 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 16, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 2, 2023
Analysis January 30, 2023