Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
House MOE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Assigned to House MOE Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|