Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2332 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis February 2, 2023