Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (56-4-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (13-0-2-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|