Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2336 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 30, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis February 2, 2023