Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2339 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023