LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2379
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona House Bill HB2379
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2023 Regular Session
Arizona House Bill HB2379
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 12, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 21, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
April 25, 2023
Analysis
April 19, 2023
Analysis
March 27, 2023
Analysis
February 23, 2023
Analysis
February 1, 2023
Analysis
January 30, 2023