Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2383 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 17, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis January 19, 2023
Analysis January 13, 2023