Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2394 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis February 24, 2023
Analysis February 1, 2023
Analysis January 31, 2023