House | 02/28/2023 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-2-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House WM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Assigned to House WM Committee | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time |